Francis v. C.R. England, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-01023 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2025 |
Case in other court: | San Bernardino Superior Court, CIVSB2436439 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:06 PM PDT |
Defendant
C.R. England, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Gina Francis
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for June 9, 2025 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before May 23, 2025. (iv) |
|
13 | 13
![]() STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) |
|
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 04/29 11:08 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John F. Walter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:25-cv-01023 JFW (PDx). (ghap) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc., of Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court served on April 25, 2025. (Kowsari, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Declaration4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Declaration3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement6 served on April 25, 2025. (Kowsari, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc. (Kowsari, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc., (Kowsari, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
![]() DECLARATION of Jessica Hale re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Kowsari, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
![]() DECLARATION of Bruce Boehm re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Kowsari, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Kowsari, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVSB2436439 Receipt No: ACACDC-39583825 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Attorney Michael M. Kowsari added to party C.R. England, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kowsari, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 04/29 10:26 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants C.R. England, Inc., Does 1-50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Gina Francis. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/31/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) |