New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:25-cv-03335
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of New Jersey, Ocean County, OCN L 343 25
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
FOREMAN TURF SPECIALTIES T/A TLC LAWN COMPANY
Plaintiff
MICHAEL PETITO


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 05/05 4:14 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2025 at 2:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/05/2025. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/02 4:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FOREMAN TURF SPECIALITIES, INC..(SHEA, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 7:07 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by FOREMAN TURF SPECIALITIES, INC.. (BELARDO, CARLEIGH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 12:02 PM
NOTICE by All Defendants(SHEA, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/28 9:52 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: T/A parties should be added as an ALIAS . Please do not enter them in the First or Last Name Fields . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 9:53 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Mon 04/28 9:57 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal and attachments contain improper signatures. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENTS WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE using the event Notice (other). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Mon 04/28 9:58 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The CIVIL COVER SHEET was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Please email a flattened version to ecfhelp@njd.uscourts.gov for replacement on the docket. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/28 3:58 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney John Shea did not file a proper appearance in this matter. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jal, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Mon 04/28 4:02 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Diversity Disclosure Statement3 filed by John Shea on 4/28/2025 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Diversity Disclosure Statement USING Diversity Disclosure Statement. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 04/25 5:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by FOREMAN TURF SPECIALTIES T/A TLC LAWN COMPANY. (BELARDO, CARLEIGH)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/25 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FOREMAN TURF SPECIALTIES T/A TLC LAWN COMPANY from Superior Court of Ocean County, case number OCN L 343 25. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16204402), filed by FOREMAN TURF SPECIALTIES T/A TLC LAWN COMPANY.(BELARDO, CARLEIGH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Removal - Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Removal - Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Certification Certification of John D. Shea, Esq.,
Att: 4 Certification Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 10.1(a),
Att: 5 Certification Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.2,
Att: 6 Exhibit Civil Case Information Sheet,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Certification Certification of Service
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/28 10:17 AM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]