New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jessica G L Clarke
Case #: 7:25-cv-03463
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332ed Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Exome Asset Management
Defendant
Samuel D. Isaly
Plaintiff
Meredith Hagen
Represented By
Tanvir H. Rahman
Filippatos PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 04/28 11:36 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 04/28 11:38 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 04/28 11:38 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 04/28 11:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Tanvir H. Rahman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/25 5:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rahman, Tanvir)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Exome Asset Management, Samuel D. Isaly(Individual Capacity), Samuel D. Isaly(Professional Capacity). Document filed by Meredith Hagen..(Rahman, Tanvir)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 4:18 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Exome Asset Management, Samuel D. Isaly(Individual Capacity), Samuel D. Isaly(Professional Capacity). (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30989064)Document filed by Meredith Hagen..(Rahman, Tanvir) Modified on 4/25/2025 (pc)
Related: [-]