Oregon District Court
Judge:Mustafa T Kasubhai
Case #: 6:25-cv-00686
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause29:2601 Family & Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:Coos County Circuit Court, 25CV17679
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 2:10 PM PDT
Defendant
Bandon Dunes L.P
Represented By
Sarah Elizabeth Ames Benedict
Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Kellam


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 5 pgs order Order Mon 04/28 2:11 PM
Case Management Order signed on 04/28/2025 by Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Fri 04/25 4:00 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/25/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/22/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 9/22/2025. Ordered by Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 2:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bandon Dunes L.P. (Ames Benedict, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/25 12:56 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 25CV17679 from Coos County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9828052 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Bandon Dunes L.P. (Ames Benedict, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1