Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Mary S Mcelroy
Referred: Lincoln D Almond
Case #: 1:25-cv-03009
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 5:07 PM EDT
Defendant
GoodRX Inc.
Represented By
David Ramraj Singh
Weil Gotshal And Manges LLP
contact info
Defendant
GoodRx Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
David Ramraj Singh
Weil Gotshal And Manges LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Community Care Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By
Halley Wilder Josephs
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Shawn Rabin
contact info
Yoonhee Gloria Park
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Henry J. Walter
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Abby Lemert
Edelson PC
contact info
William C Carmody
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Yaman Salahi
Salahi PC
contact info
Natasha J. Fernandez-Silber
Edelson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 1:20 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:25-md-3148-MSM-LDA (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. This civil action is now associated as a related case. Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), an attorney may appear and practice in the District of Rhode Island in connection with the transferred matter and the related MDL master docket. Counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of Rhode Island via[LINK:PACER] if not previously done so. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
55 55 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 04/25 3:33 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:24-cv-09490. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a)
Related: [-]
misc MDL Member Case Transferred Fri 04/25 3:47 PM
MDL Member Case Transferred from the CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Case Related to MDL No. 3148. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
54 54 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3148, transferring case to USDC, Rhode Island and assigned to Honorable Mary S. McElroy. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
53 53 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO STAY DEADLINES PENDING TRANSFER52 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. All deadlines in this case shall be stayed pending transfer to the District of Rhode Island. (iv)
Related: [-]