Connecticut District Court
Judge:Omar A Williams
Case #: 3:25-cv-00657
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Google, LLC
Represented By
LaMarte Williams, Jr.
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Errol A. Walters


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 11:34 AM
NOTICE by Google, LLC / Statement Regarding Removal (Williams, Jr., LaMarte)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 11:28 AM
Disclosure Statement / Disclosure Statement Regarding Diversity of Citizenship by Google, LLC. (Williams, Jr., LaMarte)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 11:27 AM
NOTICE by Google, LLC / Notice of Pending Motions (Williams, Jr., LaMarte)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 4:39 PM
NOTICE by Google, LLC / Notice of Service Re: Dkt Nos. 1-12 (Williams, Jr., LaMarte)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/29 2:39 PM
ORDER denying as moot ECF No.11 , Motion for Extension of Time. Having reviewed the amended complaint, which is filed with Defendant's notice of removal at ECF No.1 , the court cannot discern what specific claims Plaintiff is asserting against Defendant, or what specific conduct Defendant allegedly committed. The court finds that the operative complaint is so unclear that the court would find it difficult to review any response Defendant may be able to make thereto. "A court may, and often should, sua sponte order a more definite statement if it will facilitate its own proceedings and appellate review." Allco Fin. Ltd. v. Roisman , No. 2:20-CV-103, 2021 WL 12284779, at *2 (D. Vt. Sept. 16, 2021). Accordingly, the court instructs Plaintiff to amend his complaint on or before June 13, 2025. The court makes Plaintiff aware that now that this case is in federal court, the complaint must comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8. Failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal of the action. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 4/29/25. (Wagner, R)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/02 8:18 AM
Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/02 8:20 AM
Set Deadlines: CORRECTION-Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2025 (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/28 3:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 28, 2025 to Respond to the Complaint1 Notice of Removal, by Google, LLC. (Williams, Jr., LaMarte)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 04/28 10:51 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of2 Notice of Appearance filed by Google, LLC,9 Standing Order re: Letters,3 Disclosure Statement filed by Google, LLC,8 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,7 Standing Protective Order,1 Notice of Removal, filed by Google, LLC, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,6 Electronic Filing Order,5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order on Removed Cases
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 intord Standing Order re: Letters Mon 04/28 10:46 AM
Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/25/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 04/28 10:43 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 04/28 10:42 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/25/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 04/28 10:40 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/25/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 04/28 10:38 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2025; Discovery due by 10/27/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2025, Signed by Clerk on 04/25/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 9:44 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2025.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 5:37 PM
Disclosure Statement by Google, LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google, LLC. (Williams, Jr., LaMarte)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LaMarte Williams, Jr. on behalf of Google, LLC (Williams, Jr., LaMarte)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 04/25 5:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Google, LLC from Superior Court of Connecticut, case number NNH-CV25-5063150-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-8148818, filed by Google, LLC.(Williams, Jr., LaMarte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
utility NEW Case Assignment Mon 04/28 10:16 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Omar A. Williams assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]