Connecticut District Court
Judge:Stefan R Underhill
Case #: 3:25-cv-00658
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Yale New Haven Health Services Corp.
Plaintiff
Tyoka Brumfield
Represented By
Anja Rusi
Scott & Scott LLP
contact info
Joseph P. Guglielmo
Scott & Scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 05/09 11:38 AM
Disclosure Statement by Yale New Haven Health Services Corp.. (Bieler, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
13 13 order Order of Transfer Fri 05/02 9:58 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/2/2025.(Samson, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip H. Bieler on behalf of Yale New Haven Health Services Corp. (Bieler, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
11 11 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/29 11:12 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yale New Haven Health Services Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph P. Guglielmo* *Scott & Scott Attorneys at Law LLP* *The Helmsley Building 230 Park Avenue Ste 24th Floor* *New York, NY 10169*. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 04/29 11:07 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of7 Electronic Filing Order,6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint filed by Tyoka Brumfield,9 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Tue 04/29 10:56 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Tue 04/29 10:56 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 04/29 10:55 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 04/29 10:53 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2025 Discovery due by 10/27/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2025 Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 9:41 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/25.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 04/25 6:07 PM
NOTICE of Related Case by Tyoka Brumfield (Guglielmo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anja Rusi on behalf of Tyoka Brumfield (Rusi, Anja)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 5:39 PM
Disclosure Statement by Tyoka Brumfield. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 5:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Yale New Haven Health Services Corp. ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8148840.), filed by Tyoka Brumfield.(Guglielmo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 04/25 5:37 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Yale New Haven Health Services Corp.. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Mon 04/28 10:58 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Vernon D. Oliver assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]