Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarala V Nagala
Case #: 3:25-cv-00659
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Festival Fun Parks, LLC
Plaintiff
Alexandria Linders
Represented By
James J. Reardon, Jr
Reardon Scanlon LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/29 11:48 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Festival Fun Parks, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James J. Reardon, Jr* *Reardon Scanlon LLP* *45 South Main Street Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 04/29 11:46 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,6 Standing Protective Order,4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint filed by Alexandria Linders,5 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 1:56 PM
Disclosure Statement by Alexandria Linders. Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, James
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Tue 04/29 11:45 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Tue 04/29 11:44 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 4/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 04/29 11:43 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 4/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 04/29 11:43 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2025 Discovery due by 10/27/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2025 Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Mon 04/28 1:03 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2025.(Higgins, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against Festival Fun Parks, LLC ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8148872.), filed by Alexandria Linders Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, James
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 04/25 6:04 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Festival Fun Parks, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, James
utility NEW Case Assignment Mon 04/28 1:22 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Sarala V. Nagala assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]