California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:25-cv-03630
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Fri 04/25 5:41 PM
Application and Declaration for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rodric Petrece Stanley, Jr.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Fri 04/25 2:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/2/2025. (tn, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served along with docket sheet by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Fri 04/25 2:23 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rodric Petrece Stanley, Jr.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/25/2025) Commissary Receipt
2 2 misc Received Document Fri 04/25 2:14 PM
Additional documents received from Rodric Petrece Stanley Jr. (tn, COURT STAFF) (tn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/25/2025 (ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/25/2025) Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT, 42 U.S.C. § 1983 (no process) against Cox, Gragg, Kidd, Jessica Murad, Raulp Seuss, (Filing Fee: ifpp entered 4/25/2025). Filed by Rodric Petrece Stanley, Jr.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope,
Att: 2 Envelope