Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 1:25-cv-11124
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Boston Field Office Patricia Hyde
DHS Boston Field Office Director 1000 District Ave
Burlington, MA 01803
Defendant
HSI New England Michael Krol
408 Atlantic Ave
Boston, MA 02110
Defendant
Mr. Todd Lyons
Plaintiff
Secretary of DHS Kristi Noem
2707 Martin Luther King, Jr. Ave, SE MS 0525
Washington, DC 20528
Plaintiff
Jose Alfonso Sanchez Alfaro
Plymouth County Correctional Facility 26 Long Pond Road
Plymouth, MA 02360
Represented By
Elizabeth A. Shaw
Law Offices Of Rachel L. Rado, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Shaw on behalf of Jose Alfonso Sanchez Alfaro (Shaw, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Shaw on behalf of Jose Alfonso Sanchez Alfaro (Shaw, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 misc Copy Mailed Mon 04/28 4:33 PM
First Class mailed Order4 and Petition1 Patricia Hyde, Acting Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Boston Field Office 1000 District Ave. Burlington, MA 01803on 4/28/25. (FC)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Copy Mailed Mon 04/28 4:31 PM
First Class Mail Mailed Order4 and Petition1 to: Michael Krol, Special Agent in Charge United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Boston- HSI 10 Causeway St. Room 722 Boston, MA 02222 (FC)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Copy Mailed Mon 04/28 4:14 PM
First Class mailed Order4 and Petition1 Todd Lyons, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, 500 12th Street SW, Washington DC 20536on 4/28/25. (FC)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Copy Mailed Mon 04/28 4:13 PM
First Class mailed Order4 and Petition1 Kristi Noem, Secretary Department of Homeland Security, 2707 Martin Luther King Jr. Ave SE, Washington DC 20528-0525on 4/28/25. (FC)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Copy Mailed Mon 04/28 4:10 PM
Internal mail- mailed to Order4 and Petition1 Leave an envelope set of copies in U.S. Atty mailbox in clerks officeon 4/28/25. (FC)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Remark Mon 04/28 12:52 PM
Remark. Copy of Service order4 and Petition1 emailed to US Attorney's Office. (jm)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Service Order-2241 Petition Mon 04/28 11:04 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Response is due by May 12, 2025. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without first providing advance notice of the intended move. Such notice shall be filed in writing on the docket in this proceeding, and shall state the reason why the government believes that such a movement is necessary and should not be stayed pending further court proceedings. Once that notice has been docketed, the petitioner shall not be moved out of the District for a period of at least 48 hours from the time of that docketing. (jm)
Related: [-]
3 3 order General Order 19-02 Mon 04/28 8:23 AM
General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (JAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 04/28 8:22 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 Fri 04/25 5:12 PM
First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number AMADC-10973769 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Jose Alfonso Sanchez Alfaro.(Shaw, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form Category Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit Tabbed Exhibits