New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:25-cv-03468
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:New York Supreme Court, County of New York, 152981/2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:08 PM EDT
Defendant
John Does #1-10
Defendant
Uzivert LLC
Defendant
Symere Bysil Woods
Plaintiff
Vaughn Trotman


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 misc Jury Demand Tue 04/29 6:55 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Vaughn Trotman.(Matuza, Albert)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 6:00 PM
MOTION for Mari Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31004631. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Symere B. Woods, Uzivert LLC..(Henderson, Mari)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration ISO PHV,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting PHV
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 5:55 PM
MOTION for Julian Schoen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31004598. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Symere B. Woods, Uzivert LLC..(Schoen, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration ISO PHV,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting PHV
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tonino Sacco on behalf of Vaughn Trotman..(Sacco, Tonino)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert Robert Matuza on behalf of Vaughn Trotman..(Matuza, Albert)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert Robert Matuza on behalf of Vaughn Trotman..(Matuza, Albert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 04/28 11:13 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joanna Elizabeth Menillo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Symere Bysil Woods. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name entered incorrectly. (vf) Modified on 4/28/2025 (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 04/28 11:34 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 04/28 11:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 04/28 11:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 6:42 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Uzivert LLC..(Menillo, Joanna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/25 6:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Menillo, Joanna)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/25 6:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 152981/2025. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30989916).Document filed by Uzivert LLC, Symere Bysil Woods..(Menillo, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Uzivert LLC Aff of Svc,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Woods Aff of Svc,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Woods Aff of Svc,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Affirmation of Svc1 - Woods Aff of Svc,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Statement of Auth for Electronic Filing,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Statement of Auth for Electronic Filing,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Appearance,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Stipulation of Time to Answer,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Email