Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 2:25-bk-11605
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Fleet Rents LLC
1250 Bethlehem Pike Ste S-343
Hatfield, PA 19440-1333
Represented By
RONALD S. GELLERT
Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of United States Trustee Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building 900 Market Street Suite 320
Philadelphia, PA 19107


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:17 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
85 85 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Fri 05/09 5:07 PM
Order Granting Motion To Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Related [+] Proofs of Claims due by 6/30/2025. The Bar Date Notice shall be mailed by the Debtor by first class mail, postage prepaid, as soon as practicable, but in no event later than 5/13/25, to all known creditors holding potential pre-petition Claims. (CW)
Related: [-] 66
84 84 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (multi) Fri 05/09 12:59 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/3/2025 at 09:00 AM at ALTERNATE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE (For Trustee Use Only). (MILLER, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
83 83 order Employ Fri 05/09 8:12 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC as Counsel to the Debtor. Related [+] (CW)
Related: [-] 35
82 82 credact Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/08 3:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by WILLIAM EDWARD CRAIG Filed by WILLIAM EDWARD CRAIG on behalf of AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial. (CRAIG, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
81 81 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Thu 05/08 11:10 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by HOLLY SMITH MILLER on behalf of Fleet Rents LLC. (MILLER, HOLLY)
Related: [-]
80 80 misc Schedule E/F- (for first filing and amendments) Thu 05/08 11:09 AM
Amended Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Fee Amount $34 Filed by HOLLY SMITH MILLER on behalf of Fleet Rents LLC. (MILLER, HOLLY)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 11:11 AM
Receipt of Schedule E/F - (for first filing and amendments)([LINK 25-11605 pmm] ) [misc,schef] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A27614864. Fee Amount $ 34.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#80
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
79 79 misc Certificate of No Response Wed 05/07 10:57 AM
Certificate of No Response to Application of the Debtor for Authority to Employ Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown LLC as Counsel to the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by HOLLY SMITH MILLER on behalf of Fleet Rents LLC Related [+]. (MILLER, HOLLY)
Related: [-] 36 ,35 ,77
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
78 78 court Document Tue 05/06 2:29 PM
Document in re: Notice of Officer's Compensation Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 4002-1 Filed by RONALD S. GELLERT on behalf of Fleet Rents LLC. (GELLERT, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
77 77 misc Proposed Order Tue 05/06 2:07 PM
Proposed Order Re: Application of Debtor to Retain Gellert Seitz Busenkell & Brown, LLC as General Counsel effective as of April 29, 2025 Filed by HOLLY SMITH MILLER on behalf of Fleet Rents LLC Related [+]. (MILLER, HOLLY)
Related: [-] 35
Monday, May 05, 2025
76 76 misc Creditor Request for Notices Mon 05/05 7:03 AM
Creditor Request for Notices Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
75 75 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #57 )
74 74 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #56 )
73 73 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #55 )
72 72 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #54 )
71 71 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #53 )
70 70 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #52 )