Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:25-cv-00730
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 4:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Amazon
Defendant
UPS
Plaintiff
Kathleen McIntyre
4800 Vegas Valley Dr. Unit 127
Las Vegas, NV 89121


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 order Order Show Cause Tue 04/29 10:54 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Accordingly, Plaintiff's complaint does not establish subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing, no later than May 9, 2025, why this case should not be DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Mon 04/28 12:46 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 misc Consent for Electronic Service of Documents Mon 04/28 12:44 PM
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Kathleen McIntyre. (CAH)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 12:43 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kathleen McIntyre.(CAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 04/25 2:25 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (CAH)
Related: [-]