Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00182
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Antwaun Brown (1)
Represented By
Stuart Matthew Mones
Mones Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew R LaGrone
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 4:39 AM EDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
1 1 MAGISTRATE COMPLAINT as to Antwaun Brown (1). (jpa) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon as to Antwaun Brown (jpa) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Complaint and related materials by USA as to Antwaun Brown. (jpa) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal criminal complaint and related materials as to Antwaun Brown (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/28/25. (jpa) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
Case unsealed as to Antwaun Brown (jpa) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Unseal Complaint by USA as to Antwaun Brown. (jpa) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to Unseal Complaint as to Antwaun Brown (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/3/25. (jpa) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Antwaun Brown.. Detention Hearing set for 4/8/2025 at 10:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1860 before Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Temporary commitment issued. Remanded to USM. (gww) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
8 8 Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing pursuant to Bail Reform Act by Judge Linda T. Walker as to Antwaun Brown. Detention Hearing set for 4/8/2025 at 10:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1860 before Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (gww) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stuart Matthew Mones appearing on behalf of Antwaun Brown (Mones, Stuart) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Antwaun Brown. (pdt) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker: Preliminary Hearing Held as to Antwaun Brown. Probable cause found; defendant held to District Court. Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Tape #FTR) (pdt) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker: Detention Hearing as to Antwaun Brown. Defendant did not contest detention. Pretrial detention ordered. Written order to follow. (Tape #FTR) (pdt) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Antwaun Brown (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 4/9/2025. (pdt) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
14 14 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order with Proposed Order by USA as to Antwaun Brown. (LaGrone, Matthew) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
15 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER for Discovery Materials as to Antwaun Brown (1) re14 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/18/25. (rlh) [1:25-mj-00323-RDC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
16 16 INDICTMENT with FORFEITURE PROVISION as to Antwaun Brown (1) count(s) 1. (rlh)
Related: [-]
17 17 Defendant Information Sheet as to Antwaun Brown. (rlh)
Related: [-]
18 18 Request for Arraignment as to Antwaun Brown. (rlh)
Related: [-]