Kansas District Court
Case #: 6:25-cr-10047
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Ronald Waltrip (1)
Represented By
Ellen Albritton
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jason W. Hart
Office Of United States Attorney - Wichita
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 5:12 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to defendant Ronald Waltrip (1) count 1. (msb) Modified on 4/21/2025 to unseal case on arrest and remove "sealed" from text (ca).
Related: [-]