Love v. Williams et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer L Hall |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00499 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER granting1 Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $37.51 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/5/2025.). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/6/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 5/6/2025*** (ceg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/30 9:30 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb) |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
utility
Remark
Fri 04/25 8:35 AM
Remark: 3 Copies of D.I.3 Complaint have been received and placed in the case jacket. (cdd) |
||
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cdd) |
|
3 | 3
![]() COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Kapa, White, Devon Williams - filed by Thomas J. Love.(cdd) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Trust Fund Account Statement by Thomas J. Love (cdd) |
|
1 | 1
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Thomas J. Love. (cdd) |