Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:25-cv-00504
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 10:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
David Ellis Moore
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Andrew Mark Moshos
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Bindu Ann George Palapura
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MYW Semitech, LLC
Represented By
Stamatios Stamoulis
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info
Richard Charles Weinblatt
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 05/16 2:49 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel W. Richards, Allen S. Cross, James L. Davis, Jr, Stephanie Lara Ameri, Andrew Radsch, Fan (Frances) Zhang for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
13 13 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Wed 05/14 4:31 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Stephanie Lara Ameri. ( re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. Davis, Jr., Andrew Radsch, Daniel W. Richards, Allen S. Cross, Fan Zhang, and Stephanie Lara Ameri of Ropes & Gray LLP )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4686820).(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 05 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Wed 05/14 4:30 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for James L. Davis, Jr., Andrew Radsch, Daniel W. Richards, Allen S. Cross, and Fan Zhang. ( re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. Davis, Jr., Andrew Radsch, Daniel W. Richards, Allen S. Cross, Fan Zhang, and Stephanie Lara Ameri of Ropes & Gray LLP )( Payment of $ 250, receipt number ADEDC-4686816).(Moore, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/14 4:28 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. Davis, Jr., Andrew Radsch, Daniel W. Richards, Allen S. Cross, Fan Zhang, and Stephanie Lara Ameri of Ropes & Gray LLP - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 05/14 9:13 AM
SO ORDERED, re10 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 6/16/2025). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2025. (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Wed 05/14 4:35 PM
SO ORDERED, re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. Davis, Jr., Andrew Radsch, Daniel W. Richards, Allen S. Cross, Fan Zhang, and Stephanie Lara Ameri of Ropes & Gray LLP filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2025. (aas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
10 10 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 05/13 4:58 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to June 16, 2025 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
order SO ORDERED Thu 05/08 8:52 AM
SO ORDERED, re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran Iyer, Ray Mort, Erin Hadi, Taylor Lepore, and Richard Juang filed by MYW Semitech, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2025. (aas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Wed 05/07 9:34 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Richard Juang. ( re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran Iyer, Ray Mort, Erin Hadi, Taylor Lepore, and Richard Juang )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4681516).(Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 05 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Wed 05/07 9:32 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran Iyer, Ray Mort, Erin Hadi, and Taylor Lepore. ( re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran Iyer, Ray Mort, Erin Hadi, Taylor Lepore, and Richard Juang )( Payment of $ 250, receipt number ADEDC-4681515).(Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 9:29 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran Iyer, Ray Mort, Erin Hadi, Taylor Lepore, and Richard Juang - filed by MYW Semitech, LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/30 9:37 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/28 8:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MYW Semitech, LLC.Apple Inc. served on 4/25/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 8:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. on 4/25/2025. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 04/25 8:27 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by MYW Semitech, LLC. (jfm)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Fri 04/25 8:24 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 11,107,768 B2; US 11,538,763 B2; US 11,894,306 B2. (jfm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 04/25 8:23 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 8:22 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4669933) - filed by MYW Semitech, LLC.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet