Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc T Treadwell
Case #: 5:25-cv-00171
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
AAA Electrical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By
HOWARD JEROME STRICKLAND, Jr.
Jones Cork, LLP
contact info
Defendant
DENNIS BROWN
Represented By
HOWARD JEROME STRICKLAND, Jr.
Jones Cork, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH ERDMAN


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Removal (IFP) Mon 04/28 5:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (IFP) against KENNETH ERDMAN, III All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (STRICKLAND, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court File,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal Filed in Bibb Co. State Court
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 04/28 12:17 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]: Exhibits and/or other supporting documents with an electronic filing shall be filed as a separate PDF attachment(s) to the filing. See Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing. REFILE your pleadings using event Civil Events > Initial Pleadings and Service > Attorney Initiating Documents > Notice of Removal (IFP) and be sure to separate the exhibits and attach each one individually within the same event.(rka)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal, filed by DENNIS BROWN, AAA ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS INC
Friday, April 25, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/25 6:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL against KENNETH ERDMAN Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4928846, $405 filed by All Defendants All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (STRICKLAND, HOWARD)
Related: [-]