Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc T Treadwell
Case #: 5:25-cv-00172
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
AAA Electrical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By
HOWARD JEROME STRICKLAND, Jr.
Jones Cork, LLP
contact info
Defendant
DENNIS BROWN
Represented By
HOWARD JEROME STRICKLAND, Jr.
Jones Cork, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH ERDMAN


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Removal (IFP) Mon 04/28 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (IFP) against All Plaintiffs All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (STRICKLAND, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court File,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal Filed in Bibb Co. State Court
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 04/28 12:44 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Exhibits and/or other supporting documents with an electronic filing shall be filed as a separate PDF attachment(s) to the filing. Please re-file to separate exhibits from Main document. Exhibits should include a description of attachment(s) A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedure.(elp) Modified on 4/28/2025 to add second deficiency notice (elp). Notice of Deficiency
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal, filed by DENNIS BROWN, AAA ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS INC 1 Notice of Removal, filed by DENNIS BROWN, AAA ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS INC
Friday, April 25, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/25 6:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL against KENNETH ERDMAN Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4928852, $405 filed by All Defendants All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (STRICKLAND, HOWARD)
Related: [-]