New York Northern District Court
Judge:David N Hurd
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 1:25-cv-00512
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause28:3205 Garnishment
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Scott Weinbloom
Garnishee
The Vanguard Group, Inc.
100 Vanguard Boulevard
Malvern, PA 19355
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Melissa O. Rothbart
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 notice Notice - Other Tue 04/29 12:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued as to The Vanguard Group, Inc. (bas)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Writ of Garnishment Tue 04/29 12:08 PM
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued for The Vanguard Group, Inc. Answer of Garnishee to Writ due 10 days from the date of service. (bas)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order on Application for Writ of Garnishment Tue 04/29 9:09 AM
ORDER granting1 Application for Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/29/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
1 1 motion Application for Writ of Garnishment Fri 04/25 5:34 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment filed by United States of America.(bas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 2 Clerk's Notice of Writ of Continuing Garnishment,
Att: 3 Exemption Claim and Request for Hearing,
Att: 4 Answer of the Garnishee,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Garnishee