Arkansas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Richard D Taylor
Case #: 6:25-bk-70696
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
DC CHOPPERS, LLC
209 Morland Ct
Hot Springs National Park, AR 71913-5060
Represented By
Marc Honey
Honey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office of U.S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/30 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditor Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 09:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors.
8 8 misc Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu) Wed 04/30 9:24 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Branch T. Fields Creditor ARVEST BANK (Fields, Branch)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST) Mon 04/28 9:51 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 09:00 AM at Ch. 11 Tele-Meeting of Creditors. (Poullos, Donna)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee Mon 04/28 8:56 AM
Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Subchapter V Trustee(Poullos, Donna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Verified Statement of Beverly I. Brister, SubV Trustee
Sunday, April 27, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/27 11:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order of Deficiency Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/9/2025. Schedules-Documents due 5/9/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/9/2025. Corporate Resolution due 5/9/2025. Federal Income Tax Return due: 5/2/2025. Equity Security Holders due 5/9/2025.
Friday, April 25, 2025
4 4 1 pgs misc Order of Deficiency Fri 04/25 4:21 PM
Order of Deficiency Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/9/2025. Schedules-Documents due 5/9/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/9/2025. Corporate Resolution due 5/9/2025. Federal Income Tax Return due: 5/2/2025. Equity Security Holders due 5/9/2025. (Bell, Allison)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Small Business Statement of Operations Fri 04/25 2:49 PM
Declaration of Small Business Statement of Operations, Small Business Balance Sheet and Small Business Cash Flow Statement Filed by Marc Honey on behalf of Debtor DC CHOPPERS, LLC (Honey, Marc)Modified on 4/25/2025 (AB)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Receipt (Auto) Fri 04/25 2:30 PM
RECEIPT of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:25-bk-70696] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. receipt number A8809989, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/25 2:27 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by DC CHOPPERS, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 07/24/2025. (Honey, Marc)
Related: [-]