Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:25-bk-41156
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 06, 2025

Debtor
Skylab Apps, Inc.
615 Main St Ste 114
Frisco, TX 75036-4315
Represented By
Theda Whittington Page
The Page Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Michelle Chow
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 16200 Addison Road, Suite 140
Addison, TX 75001
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 12:05 AM CDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
misc Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Fri 04/25 4:33 PM
Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by Skylab Apps, Inc. Document Due 05/2/2025. (Page, Theda)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 04/25 5:11 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 25-41156 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13890665, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 44 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 04/25 4:33 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition With Schedules, Statements, and All Other Required Documents. Filed by Skylab Apps, Inc., Document Due 05/2/2025.(Page, Theda)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Fri 04/25 11:48 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Chow, Michelle with 341(a)
Related: [-]