Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Thomas P Leblanc
Case #: 2:25-cv-00565
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Case in other court:Southern District of Texas, Houston Division, 4:25-cv-01685
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Alexis Nicole Chisholm
Defendant
Estate of Marcus DeWayne Humphries
Defendant
Margaret Elaine Humphries
Defendant
Michael Dewayne Humphries
Plaintiff
Eagle Spinco Inc
Plaintiff
Lonquist & CO LLC
12912 Hill Country Blvd Suite F-200
Austin, TX 78738
Represented By
Aimee Williams Hebert
Kelly Hart Pitre (no)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lonquist Field Service LLC
12912 Hill Country Blvd Suite F200
Austin, TX 78738
Represented By
Aimee Williams Hebert
Kelly Hart Pitre (no)
contact info
Plaintiff
Westlake Corp
Plaintiff
Westlake U S 2 L L C


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 10:22 AM
MOTION for Randall C. Owens to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6257380) by Westlake Corp, Westlake U S 2 L L C, Eagle Spinco Inc. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/29/2025.(aty,Ieyoub, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed order
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 10:16 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Westlake Corp, Westlake U S 2 L L C, Eagle Spinco Inc. (aty,Ieyoub, Christopher) Modified text on 4/29/2025 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Tue 04/29 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Christopher P Ieyoub on behalf of Westlake Corp, Westlake U S 2 L L C, Eagle Spinco Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/13/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Corrective Action Tue 04/29 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Aimee Williams Hebert on behalf of Lonquist Field Service L L C, Lonquist & Co L L C regarding3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement. Action taken: Modified to indicate document issued in error. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Mon 04/28 3:34 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexis Nicole Chisholm, Margaret Elaine Humphries, Michael Dewayne Humphries, Marcus DeWayne Humphries Estate. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 04/28 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Christopher P Ieyoub on behalf of Westlake Corp, Westlake U S 2 L L C, Eagle Spinco Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/12/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Mon 04/28 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Aimee Williams Hebert on behalf of Lonquist Field Service L L C, Lonquist & Co L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/12/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/28 10:23 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to All Defendants, requested by Lonquist & Co L L C, Lonquist Field Service L L C. (aty,Hebert, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Fri 04/25 8:40 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lonquist Field Service LLC, Lonquist & CO LLC (Attorney Aimee Williams Hebert added to party Lonquist Field Service LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aimee Williams Hebert added to party Lonquist & CO LLC(pty:pla)). (aty,Hebert, Aimee)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/25 6:48 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6255159) filed by Westlake Corp, Lonquist & CO LLC, Lonquist Field Service LLC, Westlake U S 2 L L C, Eagle Spinco Inc.(aty,Hebert, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/28 2:49 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]