California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark D Houle
Case #: 6:25-bk-12673
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 28, 2025

Debtor
Happy Grub Inc
393 Greentree Rd
Norco, CA 92860-1712
Represented By
Julie J Villalobos
Oaktree Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Arturo Cisneros (TR)
3403 Tenth Street, Suite 714
Riverside, CA 92501
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 12:01 AM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Fri 04/25 3:29 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 5/9/2025. Incomplete Filings due 5/9/2025. (TS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Happy Grub Inc
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 04/25 1:49 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Happy Grub Inc (Villalobos, Julie). See docket entry #4 for correction. Case deficient for Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 5/9/2025. Incomplete Filings due 5/9/2025. Modified on 4/25/2025 (TS)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Fri 04/25 2:03 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Cisneros (TR), Arturo with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/28/2025 at 02:00 PM via Zoom - Cisneros: Meeting ID 981 932 8338, Passcode 8145818592, Phone 1 909 498 9294. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Fri 04/25 3:29 PM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] (TS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Happy Grub Inc
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 04/25 3:30 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. Related [+] (TS)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Happy Grub Inc