Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00131
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:07 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose C Valencia-Soriano (1)
Represented By
Angela Williams
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Kcmo Walnut Street
contact info
Christopher A Bowers
The Bowers Law Office, LLC
contact info
FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sean T Foley
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info
William A. Alford, III
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info
David Andrew Barnes
United States Attorney'S Office-Kcmo
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 5:15 AM CDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
ARREST of Jose C Valencia-Soriano (Baldwin, Joella) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano (1). (Baldwin, Joella) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano. (Baldwin, Joella) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to continue detention hearing by USA as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano. (Baldwin, Joella) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano held on 3/28/2025. All parties present. Defendant present in custody with on-duty FPD and the Interpreter. Interpreter sworn. Defendant advised of the charges and his rights. Defendant confirms understanding and requests court-appointed counsel. Court grants oral motion to appoint counsel; written order to follow. FPDs office to be appointed with on-duty FPD appointed as full counsel for today's proceedings. Order to issue. Financial affidavit to be completed and filed. Defendant confirms he has a copy of the complaint and affidavit and understands his rights. Government's counsel summarizes the charges in the complaint and the range of punishment. Defendant advised of his right to a preliminary hearing. Government has moved for a detention hearing and to continue same - continuance granted. Defendant remanded to the U.S. Marshals and temporarily detained pending further proceedings. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 4/2/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6D, Kansas City before Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. Court advised the defendant of rights pursuant to FRCP 5(d)(1)(F). As required by Rule 5(f), the Court orders the United States to produce all exculpatory evidence to the Defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, disciplinary action, and contempt proceedings. Written order to follow. Counsel appearing for USA: David Barnes. Counsel appearing for Defendant: Lesley Smith (duty). Time in court: 2:04 p.m. to 2:14 p.m. Name of interpreter: Rosario Garriga. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Joella Baldwin, 816-512-5052. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORAL MOTION to appoint counsel by Jose C Valencia-Soriano. (Baldwin, Joella) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano. Re 5 MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Jose C Valencia-Soriano Signed on 3/28/25 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts.(Baldwin, Joella) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Christopher A Bowers appearing for Jose C Valencia-Soriano. (Attorney Christopher A Bowers added to party Jose C Valencia-Soriano(pty:dft))(Bowers, Christopher) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Angela Williams appearing for Jose C Valencia-Soriano. (Attorney Angela Williams added to party Jose C Valencia-Soriano(pty:dft))(Williams, Angela) Modified on 3/31/2025 main document 8 replaced at the request of counsel to correct case number only. NEF regenerated to all parties.(Kern, Kendra) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sean T Foley appearing for USA. Removing David A. Barnes (Attorney Sean T Foley added to party USA(pty:pla))(Foley, Sean) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
10 10 AFFIDAVIT of Financial Status of Jose C Valencia-Soriano. (Williams, Angela) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE William A. Alford, III appearing for USA. As Co-Counsel (Attorney William A. Alford, III added to party USA(pty:pla))(Alford, William) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
13 13 BOND REPORT as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano. Document is available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter PACER login and password first for authentication. (Barker, Melissa) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
14 14 ORDER terminating counsel as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano - FPD and Angela Williams terminated as retained counsel has entered an appearance. Signed on 4/2/2025 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Nolte, Melissa) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy: PRELIMINARY HEARING and DETENTION HEARING as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano held on 4/2/2025. All parties present and ready for hearing; Defendant appears in person and in custody. Defendant presents signed waivers of certified interpreter; Court directs same to be filed in ECF. Interpreter sworn. Parties advise they are not contesting probable cause. Parties stipulate to the factual content of the affidavit attached to the complaint as being the direct testimony of Special Agent Derek Velazco. No additional evidence as to probable cause presented by either party. The Court finds probable cause established. Defendant bound over to the U.S. District Court for grand jury action. As required by Rule 5(f), the Court orders the United States to produce all exculpatory evidence to the Defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, disciplinary action, and contempt proceedings. Defense counsel advises that Defendant does not contest detention at this time. Parties confirm receipt of the Pretrial Services Report and stipulate to the factual content of the Pretrial Services Report as being the direct testimony of the Pretrial Services Officer. The Court orders Defendant to remain in the custody of the U.S. Marshals pending further proceedings. A written order will follow. Counsel appearing for USA: Sean Foley and Trey Alford. Counsel appearing for Defendant: Christopher Bowers. Pretrial/Probation Officer: Penney Hodges. Time in court: 10:05 a.m. to 10:17 a.m. Name of interpreter: Isaura Broste. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Melissa Nolte, 816-512-5774. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Nolte, Melissa) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano. Signed on 4/2/2025 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Nolte, Melissa) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
17 17 CUSTODY DIRECTIVES AND ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER - Defendant Jose C Valencia-Soriano does not contest detention at this time. Signed on 4/2/2025 by Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy. (Nolte, Melissa) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
18 18 Waiver of Certified Interpreter by Jose C Valencia-Soriano. (Nolte, Melissa) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Spanish Waiver
Thursday, April 17, 2025
19 19 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED on 3/28/2025 as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 49.1(a), access to this document is restricted to case participants and the court. (Woods, Gloria) [4:25-mj-00040-WBG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
20 20 INDICTMENT as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
21 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy as to Jose C Valencia-Soriano. Signed on 4/23/2025 by District Judge Greg Kays.(Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]