Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00855
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 2:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Luis David Castro (1)
Represented By
Ghalib Abdulkader Serang
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shuhao Wang
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 3:56 AM CDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
Arrest of Luis David Castro (em) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Luis David Castro by Judge Anne T. Berton. (em) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton as to Luis David Castro. (em) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Luis David Castro. (em) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Ghalib Abdulkader Serang for Luis David Castro appointed. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (em) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis David Castro (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (em) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton:Initial Appearance as to Luis David Castro held on 4/9/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Luis David Castro - T. McEneny (Court Reporter ero.) (em) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Luis David Castro, ( Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/14/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Anne T. Berton,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Luis David Castro. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (em) Modified on 4/9/2025 (em). [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Shuhao Wang appearing for USA. . Attorney Shuhao Wang added to party USA(pty:pla) (Wang, Shuhao) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton:Detention Hearing as to Luis David Castro held on 4/14/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Preliminary Hearing as to Luis David Castro held on 4/14/2025; PC FOUND; DEFENDANT DETAINED WITHOUT BOND. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter ERO.) (em) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Defendant Detain Without Bond as to Luis David Castro (1). Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (em) [3:25-mj-01580-ATB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (bot1)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Luis David Castro (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Luis David Castro (bot1)
Related: [-]