Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00949
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 2:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles (1)
Represented By
Sara E. Priddy
Sara E. Priddy
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 4:26 AM CDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
Arrest of Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles (em) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles. (em) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles. (em) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Sara E. Priddy for Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles appointed. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles held on 4/1/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles - T. Saenz. (Court Reporter ero.) (em) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles, ( Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/4/2025 03:30 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,); Order Regarding Due Process and Protections Act. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles (Priddy, Sara) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Detained Without Bond as to Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em) [3:25-mj-01420-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Enriquez (bot1)
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Cristian Alexis Rivera-Angeles (bot2)
Related: [-]