Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00952
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 2:50 AM CDT
Defendant
Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan (1)
Represented By
Angelina Lugo
Law Office Of Angelina Lugo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Melissa-Rose A. Stafford
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 4:27 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
Arrest of Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan (em) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan. (em) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan. (em) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Angelina Lugo for Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan appointed. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan held on 3/26/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan - E. Gallegos (Court Reporter ERO.) (em) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan, ( Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/2/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Melissa-Rose A. Stafford appearing for USA. . Attorney Melissa-Rose A. Stafford added to party USA(pty:pla) (Stafford, Melissa-Rose) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan (Lugo, Angelina) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: DETAINED WITHOUT BOND as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mao) [3:25-mj-01280-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bot1)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Gerardo Adrian Munoz-Gaytan (bot2)
Related: [-]