Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00912
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 2:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Diego Tellez-Orozco (1)
Represented By
Damian Ryan George Rasmussen
Law Offices Of Damian Rasmussen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 4:30 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
Arrest of Diego Tellez-Orozco (mc4) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Diego Tellez-Orozco by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mc4) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Diego Tellez-Orozco. (mc4) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Diego Tellez-Orozco. (mc4) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Damian Ryan George Rasmussen for Diego Tellez-Orozco appointed. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mc4) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Diego Tellez-Orozco held on 4/4/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required: B. Espinosa as to Diego Tellez-Orozco (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (mc4) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING as to Diego Tellez-Orozco, (Preliminary/ Detention Hearing set for 4/9/2025 02:00 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Diego Tellez-Orozco. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mc4) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
6 6 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Diego Tellez-Orozco (Rasmussen, Damian) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
8 8 Letter/Correspondence regarding direct judicial assignment as to Diego Tellez-Orozco (mc4) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Diego Tellez-Orozco. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mc4) [3:25-mj-01489-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot1)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Diego Tellez-Orozco (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Diego Tellez-Orozco (bot1)
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF ENHANCED PENALTY by USA as to Diego Tellez-Orozco (bot1)
Related: [-]