USA v. Liu
California Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:25-cr-00089 |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 12:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Binghui Liu (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 1:23 AM PDT |
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on April 14, 2025: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Binghui Liu is Legs Only (USM # 73433-511). (Deputy Clerk FMN) [1:25-mj-00038-SKO] | ||
3 | 3 MINUTES (Text Only)for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT as to Binghui Liu held on 4/14/2025. After review of defendant's financial affidavit, the Court appointed the Office of the Federal Defender. Defendant advised of charges/rights; reading/advisement waived; DENIAL ENTERED. Discovery/reciprocal discovery requested and ordered. Preliminary Examination set for 4/28/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The government sought detention; defense requested a detention hearing. Detention Hearing set for 4/18/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Court ordered the defendant temporarily detained. The Court has been notified that an interpreter is required in this action for Binghui Liu. It is counsel's responsibility to timely notify the Court Staff Interpreter when a hearing requiring an interpreter is scheduled, continued or cancelled. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. See [LINK:LR 403 - Court Interpreter Services in Criminal Actions] Government Counsel: Cody Chapple present. Defense Counsel: Griffin Estes present. Custody Status: Custody - FCJ - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Mary Yang. Certified Court Interpreter: Richard Shek, Language: Mandarin-Oath on File. (Deputy Clerk FMN) [1:25-mj-00038-SKO] | |
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
6 | 6 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: DETENTION HEARING as to Binghui Liu held on 4/18/2025. The matter of detention was argued and submitted, with the Court ordering defendant detained. Preliminary Examination set on 4/28/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone remains. Government Counsel: Cody Chapple present. Defense Counsel: Griffin Estes present. Pretrial Services Officer: Brian Bedrosian (special appearance on behalf of Evette Perez) present. Custody Status: Custody - FCJ - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Otilia Rosales. Certified Court Interpreter: Richard Shek, Language: Mandarin-Oath on File. (Deputy Clerk FMN) [1:25-mj-00038-SKO] | |
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |