Maryland District Court
Case #: 8:25-cr-00126
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Rene Pop-Chub (1)
Represented By
Brittany Gail Thomas
The Office Of The Public Defender District Of Maryland
contact info
Kathryn D'Adamo
Office Of The Federal Defender For The District Of Maryland
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph L. Wenner
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 4:28 AM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Rene Pop-Chub (1). (mtds, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/14/2025 (mtds). [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 -SEALED-Government's Motion to Seal and Order GRANTING same as to Rene Pop-Chub Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 4/11/2025. (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
Interpreter Leivy Bol SWORN in case as to Rene Pop-Chub. (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
4 4 Government's Motion to Unseal Case and Order GRANTING same as to Rene Pop-Chub Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/14/2025. (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Seal by Rene Pop-Chub. (Thomas, Brittany) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
6 6 PAPERLESS ORDER DIRECTING: (1) Counsel for the Defendant to file its request as it relates to detention by no later than 4:30 p.m., today; (2) courtesy copy of the same is due to the duty AUSA by no later than 4:30 p.m., today; and (3) the Government shall file its written response by no later than April 15, 2025 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/14/2025. (dps, Chambers) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
7 7 SEALED DOCUMENT (Thomas, Brittany) Modified on 4/15/2025 (mtds). [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
8 8 Initial Appearance as to Rene Pop-Chub (Defendant informed of Rights) held on 4/14/2025. Interpreter Leivy Bol SWORN in case as to Rene Pop-Chub before Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. (FTR - Diaz 3B) (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Rene Pop-Chub. (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Rene Pop-Chub Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/14/2025. (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER pursuant to Fed R Crim P 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act as to Rene Pop-Chub Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/14/2025. (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Rene Pop-Chub Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/14/2025 - (copy emailed to USMS on 4/14/2025) (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
13 13 ORDER granting5 Motion to Seal as to Rene Pop-Chub (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/14/2025. (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
14 14 -SEALED- MOTION to Seal by USA as to Rene Pop-Chub.(Wenner, Joseph) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
15 15 SEALED DOCUMENT(Wenner, Joseph) Modified on 4/16/2025 (mtds). [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
16 16 -SEALED-ORDER granting14 Motion to Seal as to Rene Pop-Chub (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/16/2025. (mtds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
17 17 Detention Hearing as to Rene Pop-Chub held on 4/16/2025, Interpreter Daisy Robinson SWORN in case as to Rene Pop-Chub before Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms.(FTR Monica Giron - 3B) (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER granting7 and releasing Defendant into ICE custody pursuant to an ICE Detainer as to Rene Pop-Chub. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/16/2025. (c/em USMS 4/16/2025 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/23/2025 (mg3s). [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
19 19 MOTION for Review of Release Order and Motion to Stay Release Order Pending Review by USA as to Rene Pop-Chub.(Wenner, Joseph) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
20 20 PAPERLESS ORDER EXTENDING stay at18 until April 21, 2025. A Hearing has been scheduled for April 21, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. on19 Motion for Review of Release Order. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/17/2025. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING by U.S. Attorney's Office as to Rene Pop-Chub. Detention Review Hearing PLEASE NOTE: Defendant is in custody. A writ has not been requested. A come up was requested on 4/18/2025. An interpreter for Quiche or K'iche was requested on 4/18/2025. Detention Hearing set for 4/21/2025 02:00 PM in Greenbelt (for specific location, refer to court website:www.mdd.uscourts.gov/calendar/calendar.asp) before Judge Paula Xinis.(Wenner, Joseph) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING by U.S. Attorney's Office as to Rene Pop-Chub. Detention Review Hearing TIME CHANGE ONLY PLEASE NOTE: Defendant is in custody. A writ has not been requested. A come up was requested on 4/18/2025. An interpreter for Quiche or K'iche was requested on 4/18/2025. Detention Hearing set for 4/21/2025 01:00 PM in Greenbelt (for specific location, refer to court website:www.mdd.uscourts.gov/calendar/calendar.asp) before Judge Paula Xinis.(Wenner, Joseph) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
21 21 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/12/2025 in case as to Rene Pop-Chub. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
22 22 PAPERLESS ORDER rescheduling the hearing re19 Motion, for April 21, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. as to Rene Pop-Chub. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/18/2025. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
23 23 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Revocation of Order of Release by USA as to Rene Pop-Chub.(Wenner, Joseph) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support of Revocation of Order of Release
Monday, April 21, 2025
Interpreter Leivy Bol sworn in case as to Rene Pop-Chub and participated telephonically (tds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER of the Court as to Rene Pop-Chub finding that the Government has met its threshold burden, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the Defendant poses a serious risk of flight thereby triggering the need for a Detention Hearing and thereby reversing the18 Order of Release, all for the reasons stated on the record. The Court also directs Counsel to contact Judge Simms's chambers by Wednesday, April 23, 2025 to schedule a Detention Hearing, all as stated on the record by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/21/2025. (tds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
24 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathryn D'Adamo as Public Defender appearing for Rene Pop-Chub(D'Adamo, Kathryn) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
25 25 MOTION for Release from Custody and Opposition to Government Request for Detention by Rene Pop-Chub.(D'Adamo, Kathryn) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ICE Detainer
26 26 Motion Hearing as to Rene Pop-Chub held on 4/21/2025 re19 MOTION for Review of Release Order filed by USA before Judge Paula Xinis. (Court Reporter: Paula Leeper) (tds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
27 27 HEARING EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Rene Pop-Chub (tds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
28 28 Stipulation re: Return of Hearing Exhibits to Counsel (tds, Deputy Clerk) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
29 29 Correspondence re: Detention Hearing (Wenner, Joseph) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
30 30 -SEALED- MOTION to Seal by USA as to Rene Pop-Chub.(Wenner, Joseph) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
31 31 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT(Wenner, Joseph) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-4,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-5,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-6,
Att: 7 Exhibit A-7,
Att: 8 Exhibit A-8,
Att: 9 Exhibit A-9,
Att: 10 Exhibit A-10,
Att: 11 Exhibit A-11,
Att: 12 Exhibit A-12,
Att: 13 Exhibit A-13,
Att: 14 Exhibit A-14,
Att: 15 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 16 Exhibit B-2,
Att: 17 Exhibit B-3,
Att: 18 Exhibit B-4,
Att: 19 Exhibit B-5,
Att: 20 Exhibit C-1
Thursday, April 24, 2025
PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING by U.S. Attorney's Office as to Rene Pop-Chub. PLEASE NOTE: Defendant is in custody. A writ has not been requested. A come up was requested on 4/24/2025. An interpreter for Spanish was requested on 4/24/2025. Detention Hearing set for 4/30/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B, 6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770, before Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms.(Wenner, Joseph) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
32 32 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brittany Gail Thomas as Public Defender appearing for Rene Pop-Chub(Thomas, Brittany) [8:25-mj-00941-AAQ]
Related: [-]
33 33 INDICTMENT as to Rene Pop-Chub (1) count(s) 1. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]