New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00864
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 1:50 AM MDT
Defendant
Felipe Ortega-Rivera (1)
Represented By
Barbara A Mandel
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jackson Kemper Dering
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 3:49 AM MDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
Arrest of Felipe Rivera-Ortega (bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
Hearing as to Felipe Rivera-Ortega: Initial Appearance set for 4/25/2025 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (bw)
Related: [-]