Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-00012
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 2:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Solorio-Martinez (1)
Represented By
Jeffrey Scott Harrelson
Harrelson Law Firm, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lauren Richards
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 3:26 AM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
Attorney update in case as to Jose Solorio-Martinez. Attorney Lauren Richards for USA added. (nlp)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jose Solorio-Martinez (nlp)
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Jose Solorio-Martinez (nlp)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Solorio-Martinez (1). (nlp)
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter: Initial Appearance as to Jose Solorio-Martinez held on 4/24/2025 from 03:03 - 03:15.. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Lauren Richards; Defense - Jeff Harrelson. No exhibits. (Court Reporter - Digital Recording) Dft Location: Custody. (nlp)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL PURSUANT TO THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACT This Court has determined that the above-named Defendant is financially unable to obtain adequate representation in the above-styled case and is otherwise qualified for appointment of counsel. Accordingly, pursuant to the Criminal Justice Act (18 U.S.C. §3006A), this Court appoints Jeff Harrelson, a member of the Criminal Justice Act Panel of this District, to represent Jose Solorio-Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 4/24/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER of Detention as to Jose Solorio-Martinez.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter on 4/24/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]