California Central District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00213
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 12:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Erasmo Jose Corral (1)
Represented By
Michael L. Brown, II
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Defendant
Wendy Xitlali Gutierrez (2)
Represented By
Michael S Evans
Michael S Evans Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Sylvia Martinez (3)
Represented By
Anthony M. Solis
Anthony M. Solis Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Ramon Olvera (4)
Represented By
Benjamin P. Lechman
Law Offices Of Benjamin P. Lechman, Esq.
contact info
Robert Kim Schwarz
Schwarz Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew Coe-Odess
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Robert K. Quealy
Sausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 1:41 AM PDT
Thursday, January 16, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral, Wendy Xitali Gutierrez, Sylvia Martinez, Ramon Olvera in violation of 18:1951(a), 924(c). Approved by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar as to Erasmo Jose Corral (1), Wendy Xitali Gutierrez (2), Sylvia Martinez (3), Ramon Olvera (4). (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Wendy Xitali Gutierrez (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Sylvia Martinez (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ramon Olvera (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral; defendants Year of Birth: 2005; date of arrest: 3/7/2025 (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORAL MOTION to unseal Complaint. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral, GRANTING 12 Oral Motion to unseal Complaint as to Erasmo Jose Corral (1). Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Michael L. Brown, II for Erasmo Jose Corral, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 4/10/2025 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Defendant makes a motion for Court to file detention order under seal; Court GRANTS Defendant's motion and will file a redacted detention order. Court Smart: CS 3/7/25. (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
14 14 REDACTED MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral. Court Smart: CS 3/7/25. (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
15 15 SEALED UNREDACTED Order as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral re: In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held14 (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
16 16 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
17 17 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
18 18 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral. (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral is directed to appear and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 4/10/25 at 11:30 AM before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
20 20 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral, declaring that I have never been issued any passport or other travel document by any country. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
21 21 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Wendy Xitali Gutierrez; defendants Year of Birth: 2004; date of arrest: 3/10/2025 (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
22 22 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Wendy Xitali Gutierrez (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
23 23 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero as to Defendant Wendy Xitali Gutierrez. Contested detention hearing held. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as Wendy Xitlali Gutierrez. Attorney: Michael S Evans for Wendy Xitali Gutierrez, Appointed, present. Court orders defendant permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 3/28/2025 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Court Smart: CS 3/10/25. (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
24 24 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Wendy Xitali Gutierrez. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
25 25 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Wendy Xitali Gutierrez. (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero as to Defendant Wendy Xitali Gutierrez (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Wendy Xitali Gutierrez is directed to appear and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 3/28/25 at 11:30 AM before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
28 28 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Defendant Wendy Xitali Gutierrez (ja) [2:25-mj-00169-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
39 39 MINUTES OF POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT: held before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Defendant Ramon Olvera (4) Count 1,2,4. Defendant arraigned, states true name is the name on the charging document. Defendant entered not guilty plea to all counts as charged. Attorney: Benjamin P. Lechman, Special appearance by Anthony Solis, Appointed present. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright,II.( Jury Trial set for 5/27/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Otis D. Wright II.), (Spanish) INTERPRETER Required as to Defendant Ramon Olvera. Judge Wright is located in 5D, Los Angeles - United States Courthouse, 350 W 1st Street, CA 90012-4565. Court Smart: 03/21/2025. (tba)
Related: [-]
40 40 MINUTES OF POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT: held before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick as to Defendant Sylvia Martinez (3) Count 1,2,4. Defendant arraigned, states true name is Sylvia Esperanza Martinez. Defendant entered not guilty plea to all counts as charged. Attorney: Anthony M. Solis, Appointed present. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright,II. Jury Trial set for 5/27/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. Judge Wright is located in 5D, Los Angeles - United States Courthouse, 350 W 1st Street, CA 90012-4565. Court Smart: 03/21/2025. (tba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
29 29 INDICTMENT Filed as to Erasmo Jose Corral (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, Wendy Xitlali Gutierrez (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4, 5, Sylvia Martinez (3) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Ramon Olvera (4) count(s) 1, 2, 4. Offense occurred in VEN. (mhe)
Related: [-]
30 30 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Matt Coe-Odess as to Defendant Erasmo Jose Corral; defendants Year of Birth: 2005 (mhe)
Related: [-]
31 31 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Matt Coe-Odess as to Defendant Wendy Xitlali Gutierrez; defendants Year of Birth: 2004 (mhe)
Related: [-]
32 32 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Matt Coe-Odess as to Defendant Sylvia Martinez; defendants Year of Birth: 1974 (mhe)
Related: [-]
33 33 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Matt Coe-Odess as to Defendant Ramon Olvera; defendants Year of Birth: 1995 (mhe)
Related: [-]
36 36 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Sylvia Martinez (mhe)
Related: [-]
37 37 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ramon Olvera (mhe)
Related: [-]