District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00083
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 3:32 AM EDT
Defendant
EWORLDTRADE, LLC (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jayce Born
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2025 4:53 AM EDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
1 1 3 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to EWORLDTRADE, LLC (1) count(s) 1. (CRIMINAL FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zstd)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to EWORLDTRADE, LLC.(zstd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
4 4 1 pgs ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to EWORLDTRADE, LLC (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Sharbaugh on 3/27/2025. (zstd)
Related: [-]