California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:25-cv-03357
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 25CV113662
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
Represented By
Curie Lee
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Michael David Weil
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Natalia Casa
Represented By
Jose M Herrera
Haulk & Herrera LLP
contact info
Matthew Anthony Haulk
Ragghianti Freitas LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 04/29 3:47 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference will be held by Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 7/21/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2025, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 25, 2025, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/25 8:52 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 04/25 7:49 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tesla, Inc... (Weil, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tesla, Inc... (Weil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Curie Lee on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Lee, Curie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See[LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tesla, Inc. for Tesla, Inc.. re1 Notice of Removal, (Weil, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 25CV113662. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20570181). Filed by Tesla, Inc..(Weil, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Certificate/Proof of Service
Answer to Removal Complaint Exhibit C by Defendants Tesla, Inc's.. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]