Washington Western District Court
Judge:John H Chun
Referred: David W Christel
Case #: 3:25-cv-05354
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 order Order Directing Service Wed 04/30 3:06 PM
ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, § 2254 PETITION electronically to Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Washington. (This Order, and1 Petition emailed on 4/30/2025.) Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (MW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
utility Notice to Filer Mon 04/28 8:22 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:25-cv-0748 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number and Judge assignment: 3:25-cv-05354-JHC-DWC. Before initiating a new case, please review the[LINK:Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF)] to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/25 11:16 AM
Judge Unassigned added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/25 1:26 PM
Judge John H. Chun and Judge David W. Christel added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
2 2 BRIEF In Support Of Petition For A Writ Of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Randy Louis Donaldson (Lobsenz, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Related [+] filed by Randy Louis Donaldson.(Lobsenz, James)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8942967
Att: 1 Exhibit Appendix A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Appendix B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Appendix C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Appendix D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Appendix E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Appendix F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Appendix G