California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01462
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 12:33 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Carlos Arguello
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Corina Villegas (1)
Terminated: 04/17/2025
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Nora L. Stephens
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 1:22 AM PDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
Arrest of Corina Villegas (no document attached) (cxl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
1 1 OUT OF DISTRICT COMPLAINT as to Corina Villegas.(cxl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 info sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Corina Villegas: Initial Appearance - ODC set for 3/28/2025 before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Carlos Arguello appearing for USA. (Arguello, Carlos)Attorney Carlos Arguello added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi).
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Initial Appearance - Out of District Complaint as to the "person charged as" Corina Villegas held on 3/28/2025. Federal Defenders appointed for Corina Villegas. Rul 5 advisement provided. Government oral motion to detain(Flight). ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 4/1/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Removal/ID Hearing set for 4/8/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major.) (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 3/28/2025 BLM 25-1:2:48;3:05-3:10). (Plaintiff Attorney Stephen Simpson AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Cassidy Heverling FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Corina Villegas. (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Corina Villegas (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Corina Villegas: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/28/25. (aje)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Corina Villegas (ave)
Related: [-]