South Carolina District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00225
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 3:16 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael Gregory Shedd
Us Attorneys Office (cola)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Target Telephone (1)
Terminated: 02/14/2025


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 3:35 AM EDT
Friday, February 14, 2025
1 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Target Telephone. (asni, )
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal as to Target Telephone (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J Gossett on 1/28/2025.(asni, )
Related: [-]
5 5 Application and Affidavit for Tracking Warrant(asni, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Attachment A,
Att: 3 Attachment B
6 6 Tracking Warrant Issued 1/28/2025 in case as to Target Telephone (asni, )
Related: [-]