USA v. Sealed Seizure Warrant
Florida Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:25-mj-02857 |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 3:28 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
USA
|
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Sealed Seizure Warrant (1)
Terminated: 04/25/2025
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 3:36 AM EDT |
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
1 | 1 SEALED Seizure Warrant for Property Subject to Forfeiture Issued. Issued on 4/25/2025 (cdb1) |