Kansas District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-08053
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2025
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 2:16 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Trent M. Krug
Office Of United States Attorney - Kcks
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Uriel Jose Balderas (2)
Terminated: 04/09/2025
Represented By
Dionne M. Scherff
Joseph, Hollander & Craft, Llc - Op
contact info
Defendant
Manuel Humberto Cuellar-Amezquita (1)
Terminated: 04/09/2025
Represented By
Timothy H. Burdick
Office Of Federal Public Defender - Kcks
contact info
Defendant
Jorge Humberto Garcia-Cuellar (4)
Terminated: 04/09/2025
Represented By
Robert Nicholas Calbi
Law Offices Of Robert N. Calbi
contact info
Defendant
Elder Josue Gomez Tabora (3)
Terminated: 04/09/2025
Represented By
Jane Francis
Law Office Of Jane Francis, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 2:35 AM CDT
Saturday, March 29, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT filed against Manuel Humberto Cuellar-Amezquita (1), Uriel Jose Balderas (2), Elder Josue Gomez Tabora (3), Jorge Humberto Garcia-Cuellar (4). (jal)
Related: [-]