Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 0:25-cv-60810
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 10:05 AM EDT
Defendant
BESPOKE SMILES DENTISTRY, PA
Plaintiff
Nicholas Pagan
Represented By
Alberto R. Leal
Alberto R. Leal, Esq., P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 05/01 11:16 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nicholas Pagan. BESPOKE SMILES DENTISTRY, PA served on 4/29/2025, response/answer due 5/20/2025. (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 10:28 AM
Summons Issued as to BESPOKE SMILES DENTISTRY, PA. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 04/28 10:18 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 9:38 AM
COMPLAINT against BESPOKE SMILES DENTISTRY, PA. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18401774, filed by Nicholas Pagan.(Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet