Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:25-cv-80510
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 10:05 AM EDT
Defendant
IDEAL DENTAL BOYNTON BEACH PLLC
Plaintiff
Nicholas Pagan
Represented By
Alberto R. Leal
Alberto R. Leal, Esq., P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 05/01 11:19 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nicholas Pagan. IDEAL DENTAL BOYNTON BEACH PLLC served on 4/29/2025, response/answer due 5/20/2025. (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 04/30 11:07 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/30/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 respm Response/Reply (Other) Tue 04/29 3:36 PM
First RESPONSE to order requiring Verified Certificate of Counsel by Nicholas Pagan. (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order of Requirements Tue 04/29 12:46 PM
ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 04/29 12:43 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 10:36 AM
Summons Issued as to IDEAL DENTAL BOYNTON BEACH PLLC. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 04/28 10:33 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 9:45 AM
COMPLAINT against IDEAL DENTAL BOYNTON BEACH PLLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18401800, filed by Nicholas Pagan.(Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet