Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Case #: 0:25-cv-60811
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 12:06 PM EDT
Defendant
The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Michelle Bowling
Represented By
Cesar Gavidia, Jr.
Attorneys Dell & Schaefer Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 04/29 9:38 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Michelle Bowling. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 4/29/2025, response/answer due 5/20/2025. (Gavidia, Cesar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/28 2:35 PM
Summons Issued as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (cwc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 04/28 2:31 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18402479, filed by Michelle Bowling.(Gavidia, Cesar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit Disability Policy