Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Case #: 1:25-cv-21913
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:11th JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, IN AND FOR MIAMI-DADE COUNT, 25-002528-CA-01
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 12:07 PM EDT
Defendant
CENTURY SURETY COMPANY
Represented By
Jennifer Virginia Ortega
Simon, Reed & Salazar, P..A.
contact info
Michael Simon
Simon, Reed & Salazar, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
YOSAHIRA COLEMAN, INC.
Represented By
Ryan Louis Gontrum
Mcdonald Barnhill PA
contact info
David Duff Barnhill
Mcdonald & Barnhill, P.A.
contact info
Andrew Philip McDonald
Mcdonald & Barnhill, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Filing State Court Docket Sheet by CENTURY SURETY COMPANY re3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report (Ortega, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 7 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 04/29 11:28 AM
ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/19/2025 Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (cwc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 04/28 11:50 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Mon 04/28 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18402434, filed by CENTURY SURETY COMPANY.(Ortega, Jennifer) (No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed) Text Modified on 4/28/2025 (cwc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Comp B - State Court Cover Sheet/Complaint/Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Comp C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D