Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 2:25-cv-03375
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Florida Middle, 8:25-cv-00913
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 12:08 PM EDT
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
Defendant
ZINC HEALTH SERVICES LLC
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
Defendant
Optum Inc.
Defendant
OPTUMRX INC.
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
Defendant
ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE INC.
Defendant
EMISAR PHARMA SERVICES LLC
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
Defendant
Ascent Health Services LLC
Plaintiff
Pasco County, Florida
Represented By
DAVID R. BUCHANAN
Seeger Weiss, LLP
contact info
Roland Tellis
Baron & Budd, P.C.
contact info
MARK P PIFKO
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Matthew D. Schultz
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Rebecca Timmons
Levin Papantonio
contact info
Burton LeBlanc
Baron & Budd Pc - Baton Rouge, La
contact info
BRANDON LEE BOGLE
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Christine C Mansour
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Catherine Hancock Dorsey
Baron & Budd Pc - Washington, Dc
contact info
STEVEN J. DAROCI
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info
Benjamin Widlanski
Kozyak, Tropin & Throckmorton, PA
contact info
Jorge L. Piedra
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Rachel Sullivan
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Tal J. Lifshitz
Kozyak, Tropin & Throckmorton, PA
contact info
Russell W. Budd
Baron & Budd, PC
contact info
Daniel DiClemente
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/08 11:37 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pasco County, Florida. ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE INC. waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025; EVERNORTH HEALTH INC. waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025; EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC. waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025; Express Scripts Inc. waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025; Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025; MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (BOGLE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/08 11:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pasco County, Florida. Ascent Health Services LLC waiver sent on 5/8/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (BOGLE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/06 11:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pasco County, Florida. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025. (BOGLE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/06 10:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pasco County, Florida. EMISAR PHARMA SERVICES LLC waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025; OPTUMRX INC. waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025; Optum Inc. waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025; OptumInsight Inc. waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025; UnitedHealth Group Inc waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025. (BOGLE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/06 9:59 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pasco County, Florida. CAREMARK L.L.C. waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025; CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025; CAREMARK RX L.L.C. waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025; CVS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025; ZINC HEALTH SERVICES LLC waiver sent on 4/21/2025, answer due 6/20/2025. (BOGLE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/01 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON LEE BOGLE on behalf of Pasco County, Florida (BOGLE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer Mon 04/28 11:33 AM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:25-cv-00913. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
6 6 mdl MDL Transfer Order (out) Mon 04/28 10:42 AM
MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of New Jersey MDL case number: 3080 (CTR)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/28 9:21 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/21/2025 by Pasco County, Florida as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Bogle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/28 9:19 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/21/2025 by Pasco County, Florida as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Bogle, Brandon)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/28 11:42 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. (krg, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Mon 04/28 12:59 PM
Pursuant to a transfer order entered in MDL No. 3080 on 4/28/2025, Middle District of Florida case number 8 25-00913 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 2:25-cv-3375. In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080. (krg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after any defendant appears. Each party must also file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template attached to this Order (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab) within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/14/2025. (KMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:25-cv-913-KKM-CPT. (AA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
1 1 217 pgs COMPLAINT against Ascent Health Services, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, CVS PHARMACY, INC., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Emisar Pharma Services, LLC, Evernorth Health, Inc. (formerly Express Scripts Holding Company), Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Novo Nordisk Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., Optumrx, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Unitedhealth Group, Inc., Zinc Health Services, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23238338) filed by Pasco County, Florida.(Timmons, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet