USA v. Binance.com Account
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon D Oliver |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00665 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Claimant
Hassan Gamal Ibrahim Salem
|
|
Defendant
Binance.com Account held by User ID 450411044 in the name of Hassan Gamal Ibrahim Salem
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,4 Standing Protective Order,5 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,1 Complaint filed by USA,3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2025.(Gaskins, A) |
|
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/28/2025.(Gaskins, A) |
|
3 | 3
![]() ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 4/28/2025.(Gaskins, A) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice re: Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/28 1:46 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2025.(Maturo, F.) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Binance.com Account held by User ID 450411044 in the name of Hassan Gamal Ibrahim Salem, filed by USA.(Nelson, David) |
|
utility
NEW Case Assignment
Mon 04/28 2:09 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Vernon D. Oliver assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector. (Freberg, B) |