Colorado District Court
Judge:Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:25-cv-01324
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1101 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 11:05 AM MDT
Defendant
The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Jennifer Kaufman
Represented By
Thomas A. Bulger
Silvern & Bulger, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 04/30 11:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kaufman. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 4/29/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. (Bulger, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 11:07 AM
ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/29/2025. Consent Form due by 6/24/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/1/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2025 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 misc Summons Issued Mon 04/28 12:34 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 04/28 12:28 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10303677)Attorney Thomas A. Bulger added to party Jennifer Kaufman(pty:pla), filed by Jennifer Kaufman.(Bulger, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Proposed Summons