Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:25-bk-00138

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jacob A Brown
Case #: 3:25-ap-00036
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Geneva Capital, LLC, a Minnesota limited liability company
1311 Broadway Street
Alexandria, MN 56308
Represented By
Geneva Capital, LLC, a Minnesota limited liability company
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory K Crews
8584 Arlington Expressway
Jacksonville, FL 32011
Represented By
Eugene H Johnson
Johnson Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Tue 04/29 12:57 PM
Summons issued on Geneva Capital, LLC, a Minnesota limited liability company along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 05/29/2025. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice Of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding/Party/Parties Tue 04/29 9:37 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Filed by Eugene H Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory K Crews. (Johnson, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 04/28 11:27 AM
Complaint by Gregory K Crews against Geneva Capital, LLC, a Minnesota limited liability company. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)]. (Johnson, Eugene)
Related: [-]