California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:25-bk-13483
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
New Chance LLC
578 Washington Blvd. #833
Los Angeles, CA 90292
Represented By
New Chance LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Hatty K Yip
Office Of The Ust/doj
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/30 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor New Chance LLC
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 04/30 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor New Chance LLC
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 04/30 10:03 AM
Hearing Set re1 Chapter 11 initial status conference. Status hearing to be held on 6/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (LG)
Related: [-]
4 4 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 04/30 10:02 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Chapter 11 Status And Case Management Conference. June 12, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/30/2025 (LG)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Tue 04/29 2:09 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/27/2025 at 09:15 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/28/2025. (LL2)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 04/28 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by SM. Receipt Number 22004119. (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/28 10:21 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual - Fee Amount: $1738.00; filed by New Chance LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 5/12/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 5/12/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 5/12/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 5/12/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 5/12/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 5/12/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 5/12/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 5/12/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 5/12/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 5/12/2025. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 5/12/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2025. (SM)
Related: [-]